Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
A&Y Rehabilitation Medical Center, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Patino, Richard, against Infinity Insurance Company, represented by Villegas, Jose L, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is filed by A&Y Rehabilitation Medical Center on behalf of Gustavo Bourzac Gomez against Infinity Insurance Company. The complaint seeks money damages, a declaration under Chapter 86 of the Florida Statutes, and injunctive relief relat...
Request for Admissions
Date: September 07, 2021Complaint
Date: September 07, 2021Request for Production
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CM Deadline Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order: DEFENDANT TO COMPLY WITH ORDER IN 10 DAYS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time for DEFENDANT TO HAVE ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS TO RESPOND Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.