Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mold Care Corp Aao Ernesto Perez, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Holland, Janelys, Esq, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Brown, Dorian A, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness ($15,001 - $30,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Mold Care Corp on behalf of Ernesto Perez against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. The complaint alleges damages under an insurance policy due to the loss of property. The value of the property loss is stated to be ...
Complaint
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES IS DEEMED FILED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Compel PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND IN 10 DAYS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.