Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
The Right Spinal Clinic, Inc., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Arias, Kelly M, against Geico General Ins. Co., represented by Griggs, Marcus B., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is filed by The Right Spinal Clinic, Inc. against Geico General Insurance Company. The plaintiff is a Florida corporation that provides medical services to individuals who have sustained personal injuries in motor vehicle collisions. T...
Complaint
Date: September 07, 2021Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: December 17, 2021Request for Production
Date: September 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE ORDER ON THE PARTIES MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order: GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel BETTER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO DETERMINE SUFFICIENCY OF DEFEDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.