Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Quality Medical Care, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Arias, Kelly M, against Progressive American Ins. Co., represented by Cabrera-Castro, Cristina M., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is filed by Quality Medical Care against Progressive American Insurance Company. Quality Medical Care is a Florida corporation that provides medical services to individuals who have sustained personal injuries in motor vehicle collisio...
Complaint
Date: July 01, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: June 23, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: April 21, 2022Voluntary Dismissal
Date: August 09, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: April 26, 2022Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: April 26, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: June 23, 2022Request:
Date: November 12, 2021Motion:
Date: May 10, 2022Memorandum
Date: April 28, 2022Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 23, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 13, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: May 26, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 21, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 31, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 01, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: May 10, 2022Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: April 21, 2022Settlement Agreement
Date: July 22, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: November 12, 2021Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: November 12, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 14, 2021Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: September 23, 2021Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: September 24, 2021Request for Production
Date: November 12, 2021Motion:
Date: November 12, 2021Request for Production
Date: July 20, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Agreement Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply to Affirmative Defenses Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.