Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pelier Barranco, Yamisderky, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Christian Carrazana, against Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Schwahn, Jody, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness ($15,001 - $30,000) |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Yamisderky Pelier Barranco against Avatar Property & Cas. Ins. Co. The nature of the action is for damages, with the amount in controversy being greater than $8,000 but less than $30,000. The plaintiff alleges that the defe...
Response to Request for Admissions
Date: August 30, 2021Order:
Date: June 11, 2022Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: August 03, 2021Complaint
Date: June 30, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 30, 2021Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: September 14, 2021Memorandum of Disposition
Date: June 29, 2023Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.)
Date: June 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Disposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 29, 2023 | Hearing |
FWOP Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice 06-29-2023, 11:00 A.M., VIA ZOOM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CM Deadline Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability/absence Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.