Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Munoz, Edgardo A, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Placing Case On Inactive Status - Other Reason Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability/absence Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Progress Case Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Mailed Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: PROOF OF MAILING Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication 07/19/2022 07/26/2022 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: INVENTORY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.