Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dolphin Mall Associates, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Rothberg, Barry L, against Re: Fresh Miami Beach, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2019 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Dolphin Mall Associates, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, against Fresh Miami Beach, Inc., a Florida corporation. The complaint alleges breach of a lease agreement between the parties. The lease agreement was exec...
Order of Dismissal
Date: November 25, 2020Voluntary Dismissal
Date: November 25, 2020FWOP Notice
Date: September 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Re: Fresh Miami Beach Inc. |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Re: Fresh Miami Beach Inc. |
|
November 25, 2020 | Hearing |
FWOP Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice 11-25-20 @ 10:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Re: Fresh Miami Beach Inc. |
|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3490271 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:ROTHBERG, BARRY L 333 AVENUE OF THE AMERICAS STE 44 MIAMI FL 33131-3224 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/25/2019 REGISTER#:349 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.