Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank N A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Griffin, Amanda C, Heather Griffiths Esq, against 75C Team Llc, Aventura Beach Club Condominium Association Inc, Carmona, Isabel M., Delgado, Pedro, Ultimate Medical Services Inc, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2019 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a motion for leave to amend the original complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in the Circuit Court of the Eleventh Judicial Circuit in Miami-Dade County, Florida. The original complaint was filed on July 1, 2019. The plaintiff ...
Mot to File Amended Complaint
Date: February 06, 2020Complaint
Date: September 20, 2019Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: February 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- JUNE 28, 2022 @ 9:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Change UCR Non Jury Characteristic UCR Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3040007 AMT PAID:$13.00 NAME:ANTHOUSIS, JULIE BROCK & SCOTT 2001 NW 64 STREET SUITE 130 FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3142-RECORDING FEE 1 $8.00 $8.00 3142-RECORDING FEE 1 $5.00 $5.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$13.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/18/2022 REGISTER#:304 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3100050 AMT PAID:$12.50 NAME:ANTHOUSIS, JULIE BROCK & SCOTT 2001 NW 64 STREET SUITE 130 FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT 1 $2.50 $2.50 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$12.50 RECEIPT DATE:03/17/2022 REGISTER#:310 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 59. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: AVENTURA BEACH CLUB CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.