Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lsk Network Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Santos, Mauro C, against Fernandez, Mairelys, M.R. Innovations & Solutions Llc, Olivero, Raciel, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Veronica A. Diaz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVeronica A. Diaz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2019 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by LSK Network LLC against defendants Raciel Olivero, Mairelys Fernandez, and M.R. Innovations & Solutions LLC. The plaintiff is a Florida limited liability company based in Miami-Dade County. The defendants are also residents...
Complaint
Date: September 17, 2019Notice of Hearing-
Date: November 16, 2020Motion for Contempt
Date: July 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cancellation Notice OF HEARING Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Contempt Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Contempt JULY 29, 2021 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Contempt Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 01, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Final Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Final Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 18, 2020 | Hearing |
FWOP Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- H/12/01/2020 T/ 9:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.