Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bay Plumbing Company, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Sutton, John R., against Aquam Usa, Inc., Specialized Pipe Technologies, Spt, represented by Suarez Michael F, Vital, J. Ben, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2019 |
CategoryBusiness Transactions |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint was filed on June 22, 2020, with the filing number 109222993. The document appears to be extracted from a PDF.
As for violations of statutes, the document does not explicitly mention any violations of specific laws or statutes. Ther...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Email Notice: PSB-KD@KUBICKIDRAPER.COM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, ETC. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Stay Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Special Sets MOTION TO DISMISS ANDOR FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: WITHDRAWAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: LEGAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF RELIANCE UPON EVIDENCE Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.