Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reyes, Alejandra Isabel, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hinds, Christopher Ray, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2019 |
CategoryStalking |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Order of Dismissal
Date: November 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail PETITIONER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 05, 2019 | Hearing |
DV Hearing STATUS REGARDING RESPONDENT'S TREATMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Disposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Disposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 23, 2019 | Hearing |
DV Hearing STATUS RE: DEFENDANT TREATMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- STATUS HEARING REGARDING RESPONDENT'S TREATMENT FOR 09/05/19 AT 2:30 P.M., CTRM 29-A Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 24, 2019 | Hearing |
DV Hearing PERMANENT INJUNCTION HEARING Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Temporary Injunction EXPIRATION DATE FOR THIS INJUNCTION IS:7/24/20 Due Date: 07/24/2020 Complete Date: Parties: Hinds Christopher Ray |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear RESPONDENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.