Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rehab And Therapy Wellness Of South Florida, Llc., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Brown, Felicia B, against Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company, represented by Saavedra Antonio X, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is filed by Rehab and Therapy Wellness of South Florida, LLC on behalf of Israel Ferrebus against Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company. The lawsuit is for Personal Injury Protection (PIP) damages, with the amount exceeding $5,000 but n...
Motion/petit for Enforcement
Date: December 20, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: December 04, 2019Motion:
Date: September 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Sanctions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter of Correspondence Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: OF KYRENIA MAQUEIRA Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: AFFIDAVIT OF ISRAEL FERREBUS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Sanctions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.