Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Nevers, Elvis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Michael P Maguire, against Solares, Cecilia Bernadette, Uber Technologies, Inc., represented by Robert E Paradela, Rojas, Elis M., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 17, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Elvis Nevers against Cecilia Bernadette Solares and Uber Technologies, Inc. The complaint seeks damages in an amount exceeding $15,000, exclusive of interest, costs, and attorney's fees. Elvis Nevers alleges that on Februar...
Notice of Production
Date: August 27, 2020Response to Request for Admissions
Date: December 04, 2020Request for Admissions
Date: October 26, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE FINAL. WITH THE SRS STAMP INCLUDED Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Solares Cecilia Bernadette; Uber Technologies Inc. |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE FINAL. WITH THE SRS STAMP INCLUDED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mediators Report AN AGREEMENT WAS REACHED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice: NON OBJECTION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production FROM NON-PARTY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appt of Medtrandcnfrnce Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.