Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
London Financial Company, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lubetsky, Cary A., Morales, Raul, against 244 Wynwood Project, Inc., 251 Wynwood Project, Corp., 260 Wynwood Project, Inc, Basille, Diego J., Fl Cash Home Buyers, Llc, (total of 10) See All represented by Cabrera, Roger, Dunn, Michael, Kathleen E. Bente, Wallace, Steven Elliot, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2019 |
CategoryRpmf -Commercial ($250,000 Or More) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Order:
Date: August 24, 2020Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment
Date: October 02, 2020Motion:
Date: October 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF||PLAINTIFFS ASSIGNEES AMENDED MOTION FOR REHEARING TO CORRECTPOST-JUDGMENT INTERST CALCULATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE,MOTION TO AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Substitution of Party Plaintiff GRANTED. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitution of Parties Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3080161 AMT PAID:$13.00 NAME:SPOLIANSKY, MICHAEL S. SPOLIANSKY LAW 575 NE 5TH TER, SUITE 338 FT LAUDERDALE FL 33301 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3142-RECORDING FEE 1 $8.00 $8.00 3142-RECORDING FEE 1 $5.00 $5.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$13.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/08/2022 REGISTER#:308 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 05/11/2022 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2290002 AMT PAID:$1.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3222-COPY 1 $1.00 $1.00 TENDER TYPE:CASH TENDER AMT:$20.00 TENDER TYPE:CHANGE TENDER AMT:($19.00) RECEIPT DATE:04/01/2022 REGISTER#:229 CASHIER:E324335 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ROGER CABRERA Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: LONDON FINANCIAL COMPANY LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.