Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Banerjee, Joydeep, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Hiram Montero, against Dean International, In, Robwes, Inc., represented by Juan R Serrano, Millon, Andres, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2019 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
This complaint is filed by Joydeep Banerjee against Dean International, Inc. and Robwes, Inc. The complaint alleges personal injuries and damages in excess of $15,000 resulting from an airplane crash that occurred on May 3, 2018, in Miami-Dade County...
Motion to Compel
Date: November 17, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: November 17, 2020Motion for Sanctions
Date: November 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal FINAL ORDER AS TO ALL PARTIES SRS #: 12 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: DEAN INTERNATIONAL IN; ROBWES INC. |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal FINAL ORDER AS TO ALL PARTIES SRS #: 12 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mediators Report REPORT OF MEDIATION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation Conference Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal AS TO ROBWES, INC ONLY Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: ROBWES INC. |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal AS TO ROBWES, INC ONLY Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: ROBWES INC. |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal BETWEEN PLAINTIFF VINODH KUMAR AND DEFENDANT ROWES INC. ONLY Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.