Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pennymac Loan Services Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lisa Woodburn, against Heisterman, Jimenez, Jesus, Jj Quality Builders Inc, Keys Gate Community Association Inc, Nieves, Rosalina, (total of 6) See All represented by Borell, Alexander E., Ramon C Palacio Esq, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2019 |
CategoryRpmf -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Answer
Date: April 22, 2019Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Date: November 17, 2021Order Granting Showing of Good Cause (FWOP Calendar)
Date: November 22, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: January 10, 2022Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm
Date: January 10, 2022FWOP Notice
Date: August 12, 2021Affidavit of:
Date: March 17, 2020Notice of Hearing-
Date: October 06, 2021Motion for Default
Date: March 17, 2020Answer
Date: December 21, 2021Order:
Date: November 17, 2021Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties
Date: August 16, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 02, 2019Publication Rejection Letter
Date: August 07, 2019Order:
Date: April 21, 2020Motion to Stay
Date: April 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Change UCR Non Jury Characteristic UCR Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Nieves Rosalina |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Showing of Good Cause (FWOP Calendar) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 11-18-2021 @ 9:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice 12-09-2021 Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.