Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Stuart Building Products, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Villella, Margaret Zinkler, against Cg Sunny Isles Ii, Llc, Cg Sunny Isles I, Llc, Cg Sunny Isles, Llc, Rinaldi Group Of Florida, Llc, represented by Egozi, Bernard L, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2019 |
CategoryRpmf -Commercial ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is filed by Stuart Building Products, LLC against The Rinaldi Group of Florida, LLC, CG Sunny Isles, LLC, CG Sunny Isles I, LLC, and CG Sunny Isles II, LLC. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $15,000.00, exclusive of attorneys' f...
Order of Dismissal
Date: May 14, 2019Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: May 13, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 22, 2019Complaint
Date: March 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal AND JOINT STIPULATION WITH PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: RINALDI GROUP OF FLORIDA LLC (THE); CG SUNNY ISLES LLC; CG SUNNY ISLES I LLC; CG SUNNY ISLES II LLC |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Egozi Bernard L |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Egozi Bernard L; CG SUNNY ISLES LLC; CG SUNNY ISLES I LLC; CG SUNNY ISLES II LLC |
|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: CG SUNNY ISLES I LLC |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: CG SUNNY ISLES LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.