Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Schouten, Olga Lidia, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2019 |
CategorySummary Administration $1000 & Over |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Oath of Witness to Will Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
SRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Progress Case Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum BOND Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Copy of: CLAIM MAILED TO PT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Claim Filed Against Estate FROM FPL $358.34 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Joinder, Waiver And Consent FROM JOSE CARLOS MONTEAGUDO Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response: FROM OLGA LIDIA SOHOUTEN NOT TO PROCESS WITH WILL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum R L BOND Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.