Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Torres, Paula, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by John Getz, against American Sales And Management Organization Llc, Eulen America, Inc., Ultra Aviation Services Inc, Eulen America, represented by Bauroth, Robert C., Eric D Griffin, Jr, Jahr, Christopher J, Millon, Andres, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2018 |
CategoryComm Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
This complaint is filed by Paula Torres against American Sales and Management Organization LLC, also known as Bulen America. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of Bulen America in operating an airport transportation cart at Miami Internatio...
Request for Production
Date: August 14, 2020Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: October 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2022 | Hearing |
Special Sets DEFENDANT ULTRA AVIATION SERVICES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: ITS CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appt of Medtrandcnfrnce Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hrg Special Appt 06-22-2022 @ 2:50 PM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Hearing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: DEFENDANT AMERICAN SALES. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Deposition ERNESTO RIVERO. Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.