Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Randolph H Clemente, against Clerk Of The Circuit Court For M D C Fla, Mccoy, Herbert, Mccoy, Leonarda, State Of Fla, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2012 |
CategoryRpmf -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss ACTION AND DSCHRG LIS PENDENS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 28783 P: 4874 DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Mccoy Herbert; Mccoy Leonarda; State Of Fla (dor); Clerk Of The Circuit Court For M D C Fla |
|
August 16, 2013 | Hearing |
Order of Dismissal B: 28783 P: 4874 DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 1326 P 11/20/2012 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Mccoy Leonarda |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 1326 P 11/20/2012 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Mccoy Herbert |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 969 P 11/19/2012 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Clerk Of The Circuit Court For M D C Fla |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 225 P 11/20/2012 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: State Of Fla (dor) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.