Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jamie Brian Epstein, against Clerk Of The Circuit Court For Etc, Rivera, Maritza, State Of Fl, Village Oaks Realty Ii Inc, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 2012 |
CategoryRpmf -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order 19-05 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Text REASSIGNED TO SECTION 34 PER ADM. ORDER 15-08 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 28255 P: 1543 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Rivera Maritza; Village Oaks Realty Ii Inc; State Of Fl (dor); Clerk Of The Circuit Court For Etc |
|
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Discharge/release of Lis Pendens B: 28255 P: 1543 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 24, 2012 | Hearing |
Order of Dismissal B: 28255 P: 1543 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO DISMISS THE CAUSE OF ACTION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Document Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned - No Service Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Village Oaks Realty Ii Inc |
|
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Return for Unknown Party Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Text SRVRTN NO SERVICE ON ORLANDO ROSA Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.