Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Onewest Bank, Indymac Bank, Indymac Fed Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Baso, Jesica De Vega, against Triton Tower Condo Inc, Capital One Bank, Clerk Of The Circuit Court Of Miami Etc, State Of Fla, Unifund C C R Partners, (total of 8) See All represented by Jennifer A Cordero, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2010 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Document Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 27433 P: 3553 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/e42b4af0-a1ea-410f-9f23-db035ef91783/results/08d46214-072a-4d53-95da-f39b993c7237/lines/99f52c7f-6934-4561-a868-3b5435db2e44/Doc Discharge/release of Lis Pendens B: 27433 P: 3553 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/e42b4af0-a1ea-410f-9f23-db035ef91783/results/08d46214-072a-4d53-95da-f39b993c7237/lines/99f52c7f-6934-4561-a868-3b5435db2e44/Doc Voluntary Dismissal B: 27433 P: 3553 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Guerra David; Mortgage Electronic Reg Sys Inc; Unifund C C R Partners (gp); State Of Fla; Clerk Of The Circuit Court Of Miami Etc; Capital One Bank (usa) (na); Triton Tower Condo Inc |
|
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense ATTORNEY:00033295 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Triton Tower Condo Inc |
|
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Return for Unknown Party Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 88 P 04/16/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Clerk Of The Circuit Court Of Miami Etc |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/e42b4af0-a1ea-410f-9f23-db035ef91783/results/08d46214-072a-4d53-95da-f39b993c7237/lines/a42852c2-3eee-448c-839c-4c9461f1c520/Doc Lis Pendens B: 27254 P: 0832 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee For Mortgage Foreclosure $ 906.00 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.