Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank Natl Tr Co, Morgan Stanley Sbc Capital I Inc Etc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Espinosa, Erik B, against Clerk Of The Circuit Court Miami Etc, Mortgage Elec Reg Sys Inc, Oliver, Ray, State Of Fla, New Century Mort Corp, (total of 5) See All represented by Luis G Montaldo, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2009 |
CategoryZ Do Not Use - Legacy Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Discharge/release of Lis Pendens B: 26828 P: 1860 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 26828 P: 1860 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Oliver Ray; Mortgage Elec Reg Sys Inc; State Of Fla (dor); Clerk Of The Circuit Court Miami Etc |
|
April 13, 2009 | Hearing |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 26828 P: 1860 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer ATTORNEY:00505031 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Clerk Of The Circuit Court Miami Etc |
|
March 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 118 P 03/09/2009 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: State Of Fla (dor) |
|
March 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 1689 P 03/12/2009 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Clerk Of The Circuit Court Miami Etc |
|
March 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 1461 P 03/10/2009 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Oliver Ray |
|
March 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Text SUMMON NONSRVED ON UKWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Text SUMMON NONSRVED ON UKWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 888888 P 03/10/2009 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Mortgage Elec Reg Sys Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.