Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bernard, Joane, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jaffe, Martin J, against Progressive Select Insurance Company, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with SWEET, GARY L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSWEET, GARY L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED- COLBY NUTTING SERVED ON 11.6.2020 AT 12:40PM (NO SUMMONS ATTACHED): | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 11/02/2020 CASE NUMBER 20000956CAAXMX | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NEW CIVIL FILING ASSESSED $400.00 | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #200033640 | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | EPORTAL SUMMONS $10.00 ASSESSED $10.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.