Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jones-Marken, Yvonne, Marken, Matthew, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Weisser, Kevin, against American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with SWEET, GARY L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSWEET, GARY L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 29, 2020 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND ELECTRONIC MAIL DESIGNATION (SAMANTHA E. HABERMEHL) | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND ELECTRONIC MAIL DESIGNATION (ZAF. GOSS) | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE ON 02.12.2021 | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #200033422 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.