Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jorgensen Contract Services Llc, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Leone, Dennis D, Thresher, Kimberly Donahoe, against Ward, Melanie L, Ward, Patrick L Jr, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with MCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2020 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COVER LETTER FROM THE LAW OFFICES OF DAREN RUBENFELD, P.A DATED 03.03.2022
Date: March 15, 2022MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR LACK OF STANDING
Date: April 01, 2022ORDER TO SUBMIT AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER; SIGNED 2.01.2022
Date: February 01, 2022MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: January 12, 2022COVER LETTER FROM SHANKMAN LEONE, P.A DATED 03.03.2022
Date: March 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; SIGNED 8/5/23 | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; SIGNED 8/5/23 | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES - 7/21/2023 AT 1:30 PM LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING GOOD CAUSE TO AVOID DISMISSAL AND TO SUBMIT AN AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER - SIGNED 7.24.23 | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES -07/20/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM JOINT MOTION TO STAY THE ACTION | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UMC HEARING 07/20/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM JOINT MOTION TO STAY THE ACTION | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE JACKSON FORD; KIMBERLY D. THRESHER ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF JORGENSEN CONTRACT SERVICES, LLC | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 07/20/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN A1-5, JDG: MCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.