Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Babione, Michael, Matlack, Jeanne, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Chambers, Jonathan W., against Anchor Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Barton, Robert Periklis, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with SWEET, GARY L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSWEET, GARY L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil-Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #200033086
Date: October 28, 2020ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; SIGNED 06.14.2021
Date: June 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM JULIE TREACY, ESQ DATED 05.03.2022 (FILED IN THE INCORRECT CASE) | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; SIGNED 06.14.2021 - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 6/21/2021 7:06 PM / INSTRUMENT #: 2897172 BOOK#:3234 PAGE#: 2557) | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; SIGNED 06.14.2021 | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, ANCHOR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO COUNTY COURT | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #200033086 | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANCHOR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY-RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA EPORTAL: | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 10/28/2020 CASE NUMBER 20000935CAAXMX | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NEW CIVIL FILING ASSESSED $400.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.