Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Decesare, Dominic filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with SCHWAB, CHARLES ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHWAB, CHARLES ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2020 |
CategoryFormal Administration Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY REQUEST RECEIVED & PROCESSED | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #210031721 | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 9/27/2021 4:41 PM / INSTRUMENT #: 2916497 BOOK#:3259 PAGE#: 1414) | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | FULL RECEIPT AND WAIVER | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 8/23/2021 8:34 AM / INSTRUMENT #: 2909650 BOOK#:3250 PAGE#: 2288) | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTHORIZING CLAIM TO BE STRUCK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.