Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Truist Financial, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Kilburn, Patrick James, against Jarriel, Greg, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with LEVIN, STEVEN J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEVIN, STEVEN J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2020 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES: | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING-GRANTED AND SIGNED 12/30/2020 | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT; SIGNED 12.08.2021 | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: 12/4/2020 @ 3:00PM- DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT: DENIED | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT "A" | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 12/04/2020 AT 3:00 PM IN REMOTE , JDG: LEVIN, STEVEN J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.