Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Piper'S Landing Inc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Ensor, Jacob E, against Mooney, Greg B, Sherrett, Susanne P, represented by Jules-Toussaint, Natchia, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with WATERS, JENNIFER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWATERS, JENNIFER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE
Date: October 16, 2020TRANSFER COVER LETTER:
Date: October 16, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 16, 2020AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO CIRCUIT COURT - SIGNED 9/29/2020
Date: October 16, 2020MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND DETERMINATION OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: October 21, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: March 23, 2021PROPOSED CERTIFICATE: OF TITLE
Date: March 23, 2021NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: October 16, 2020COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RETURNED FROM OFFICIAL RECORDS BK 3214 PG 596:
Date: April 12, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS- AMENDED:
Date: April 06, 2021EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE
Date: December 15, 2020NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE 3.23.2021 AT 10:00 AM :
Date: January 19, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: February 04, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: March 23, 2021PROPOSED CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS
Date: March 23, 2021CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET SHEET
Date: October 16, 2020NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RETURNED FROM OFFICIAL RECORDS:-( OR BOOK 3123 - PAGE 2728):
Date: October 16, 2020NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE FILED BY NATCHIA JULES TOUSSAINT ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENDANTS
Date: October 16, 2020SUMMARY OF EVIDENCE
Date: December 14, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: October 16, 2020NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS:
Date: October 16, 2020TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO GREG B. MOONEY; E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY
Date: October 16, 2020ANSWER
Date: October 16, 2020PAYMENT $905.00 RECEIPT #200031901
Date: October 16, 2020PLAINTIFF, PIPER'S LANDING INC'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: October 16, 2020EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE FROM GREG MOONEY TO JUDGE'S ASSISTANT WITH STAMP
Date: December 18, 2020MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO CIRCUIT COURT
Date: October 16, 2020NOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION
Date: December 18, 202020 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON GREG B MOONEY ON 7/25/2020 @ 1:25 PM
Date: October 16, 2020CASE ABSTRACT
Date: October 16, 2020SUMMARY OF EVIDENCE
Date: December 22, 2020PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10
Date: October 16, 2020TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUSANNE P. SHERRETT; E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY
Date: October 16, 2020FORECLOSURE BIDDING SHEET:
Date: March 23, 2021SUMMARY OF EVIDENCE
Date: January 13, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE; SIGNED 01.13.2021 (SALE IS SET FOR 03/23/2021
Date: January 13, 2021PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #210002132
Date: January 20, 2021CERTIFICATE OF CLERK
Date: April 06, 2021COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE:
Date: April 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RETURNED FROM OFFICIAL RECORDS BK 3214 PG 596: | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS- AMENDED: | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLERK | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE: | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED CERTIFICATE: OF TITLE | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE BIDDING SHEET: | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.