Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Newberry, Melissa, Newberry, James, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Chambers, Jonathan W., against First Protective Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with SWEET, GARY L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSWEET, GARY L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil-Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; SIGNED 05.24.2021 - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 5/27/2021 7:54 AM / INSTRUMENT #: 2891698 BOOK#:3228 PAGE#: 207) | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; SIGNED 05.24.2021 | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT: | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT: | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SECOND INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT: | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES: | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.