Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Faraco, Jeanne M filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with SCHWAB, CHARLES ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHWAB, CHARLES ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2020 |
CategoryFormal Administration Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM - SUN TRUST NOW TRUIST - &5325.84 | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 8/6/2021 4:27 PM / INSTRUMENT #: 2906847 BOOK#:3247 PAGE#: 990) | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND FINAL ACCOUNTING CONSENT TO DISTRIBUTION AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE- JAMES P. FARACO | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND FINAL ACCOUNTING CONSENT TO DISTRIBUTION AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - GREG MITCHELL | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY & CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - TRI-COUNTY ANIMAL RESCUE | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND FINAL ACCOUNTING CONSENT TO DISTRIBUTION AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - JANE L. FARACO | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.