Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Patel, Anjana, Patel, Rajesh, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Daniels, Monica Elizabeth, against First Protective Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with SWEET, GARY L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSWEET, GARY L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 12, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil-Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS: THE DANIELS LAW GROUP, PLLC | |
May 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 5.5.2021 AT 9:00 AM DEFENDANT'S MOTION: | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR REPORT; AGREEMENT: | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING LIVE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT’S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA’S RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.310(B)(6) ON 06.07.2021 | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING LIVE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE 4.26.2021: | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT’S PRIVILEGE LOG | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.