Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Steffens, Greg Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Steffens, Lynne Marie, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with MCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 29, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | IDENTIFICATION OF GREG MICHAEL STEFFENS-FLORIDA DRIVER LICENSE | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING HUSBAND'S FLORIDA DRIVER'S LICENSE | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT-LYNNE MARIE STEFFENS-SIGNED ON 10/30/2020 | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | EPORTAL SUMMONS $10.00 ASSESSED $10.00 | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ASSESSED $408.00 | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 10/29/2020 CASE NUMBER 20000621DRAXMX | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.