Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcmillion, Jason, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mcmillion, Christine, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with LEVIN, STEVEN J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEVIN, STEVEN J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE -SUMMONS SERVED ON CHRISTINE MCMILLION-10/23/2020 | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND TIMESHARING | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | STANDING ORDER OF REFERRAL TO PARENT EDUCATION CLASSES | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS-DENIED | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- JASON P. MCMILLION | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | STANDING TEMPORARY DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.