Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Department Of Revenue, Fl Dept Of Revenue Obo Brittan, Holt, Brittany Laverne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mclaren, Latwain Jerome, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with JERALD, R. GREG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJERALD, R. GREG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | EFILED SUMMONS | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO LATWAIN JEROME MCLAREN | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE/HEARING OFFICER NOTICE OF NO JURISDICTION | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopen CIVIL OTHER closed on 11/03/2022 | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | REO: STATEMENT OF GOOD CAUSE | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopened for CIVIL OTHER on 10/24/2022 | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING/DISMISSING PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SERVE PROCESS OR SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 30 DAYS W/ REPORT AND RECOMM OF CSHO | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Compliance COMPLY OR DISMISS has been created with due date of 08/26/2022 | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: JERALD , R GREGG Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.