Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Thomas, Keelan Cordell, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Greene, Erica Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with BASS, JENNIFER LESTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBASS, JENNIFER LESTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT ESTABLISHING PARENTING PLAN AND TIME-SHARING | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR MEDIATION | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONF ORDER REFERRING TO PRIVATE MEDIATION DENYING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING - 11-15-22 AT 300PM VIA ZOOM | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | PARENTING CLASS COMPLETION CERTIFICATE FOR ERICA GREENE | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR RESP/EG | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FOR 08/30/2022 AT 915AM | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL ORDER REQUIRING COMPLIANCE AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/30/22 AT 915 AM VIA ZOOM | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/30/22 AT 915 AM VIA ZOOM | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION- FOR FINAL HEARING FILED BY KEELAN THOMAS | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | PARENTING CLASS COMPLETION CERTIFICATE- KEELAN THOMAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.