Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Young, Tammie, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Cannon, Craig Justin, against Irimescu, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROGERS, STEVEN GLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
|
PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 21, 2022NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number XX 783440 | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILED SUMMONS | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION/COMPLAINT | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 422022CA001967CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.