Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Brumaire-Florence, Chrislyne I, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Florence, Kendrick Leroy, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with CRAGGS, ANN MELINDA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCRAGGS, ANN MELINDA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $31.00 Receipt Number XX 753153 | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $31.00 | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT TO BUREAU VITAL STATS | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CLS: JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND NTC OF HRG ON JULY 13 2021 AT 130 PM | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | PARENTING CLASS COMPLETION CERTIFICATE - KF | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE/HEARING OFFICER AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON 7/13/21 AT 130 | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC HEARING ON 07/01/2021 | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE / NTC OF HRG ON THURS JULY 1 2021 AT 930 AM VIA ZOOM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.