Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Padilla Almanzar, Albania, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Perez Ruiz, Leonardo, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with BASS, JENNIFER LESTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBASS, JENNIFER LESTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $18.00 | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $18.00 Receipt Number XX 838985 | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | REPORT TO BUREAU VITAL STATS | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | REPORT TO BUREAU VITAL STATS | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CLS: JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION AGREEMENT | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER FROM PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING TRIAL/FINAL HEARING | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION COMPELLING DISCOVERY | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING MEDIATION CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.