Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Harris, Renee Alleen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Russell, Tyrone Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with JERALD, R. GREG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJERALD, R. GREG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $51.00 | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $74.10 Receipt Number XX 892799 | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopen CIVIL OTHER closed on 10/10/2022 | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REOPEN DIVORCE AND TO RECLOSE FILE | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $50.75 Receipt Number XX 786744 | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION- TO REOPEN DIVORCE FILED BY RENEE HARRIS | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $50.00 | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | PARENTING CLASS COMPLETION CERTIFICATE- RENEE HARRIS | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopened for CIVIL OTHER on 10/06/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.