Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carr, Chennel, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE | |
February 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CLS: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
February 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF PROPERTY | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE OF VERNELL MCDUFFIE | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 422021CP000039CPAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/8/2021 | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00 | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $345.00 Receipt Number XX 596801 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.