Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bankunited Na, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Diagnostic Outpatient Centers, Williams, Lawrence J, represented by Dell-Powell, Denise Damaris, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 13, 2021PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: January 13, 2021EFILED SUMMONS
Date: January 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT STIPULATION | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING RENOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PLTF BANKUNITED N.A. A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS NOT ATTACHED FILED BY PLTF BANKUNITED NA | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT FILED BY PLTF BANKUNITED NA | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED BY PLTF BANKUNITED NA | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF BANKUNITED NA | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABILE ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF BANKUNITED NA | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS DIAGNOSTIC OUTPATIENT CENTERS OF OCALA INC AND LAWRENCE J WILLIAMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.