Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
21St Mortgage Corporation, Jones, Jennifer Hope, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 37-D case represented by White, Leslie Singleterry, against Jones, Michael Allen, Marion County Florida, The City Of Ocala, Unknown Spouse Of Jennifer Hop, Unknown Spouse Of Jimmy P Vaug, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with SCOTT, EDWARD LEON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCOTT, EDWARD LEON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
|
EFILED LIS PENDENS
Date: January 13, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 13, 2021RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM
Date: January 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY RE ORIGINAL DOCUMENS RETURNED PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $50.00 Receipt Number XX 691118 | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event ONLINE FORCLSR SALE on 11/16/2021 1100 AM - SALE CANCELED | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ORDER TO CANCEL SALE CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE CONT SEE DOC | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 6 assessed at sum $50.00 | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Reopened for CIVIL OTHER on 11/15/2021 | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Reopen CIVIL OTHER closed on 11/15/2021 | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | EFILED NOTICE OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.