Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Perez, Olivia L, Perez, Rodolfo, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Green, Edwin Ames, against Boaz Security Llc, Brickhouse Lodge Inc, represented by Costa, Gabriel Adrian, Riggins, Danialle, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROGERS, STEVEN GLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
|
EFILED SUMMONS
Date: January 13, 2021DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 13, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT BRICKHOUSE LODGE INC
Date: February 15, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT BRICKHOUSE LODGE INC
Date: March 05, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY RODOLFO PEREZ AND OLIVIA LOPEZ PEREZ
Date: March 09, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 13, 2021PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: January 13, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 14, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTFS RODOLFO PEREZ AND OLIVIA LOPEZ PEREZ
Date: January 15, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY RODOLFO PEREZ
Date: May 17, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTFS RODOLFO PEREZ AND OLIVIA LOPEZ PEREZ
Date: January 15, 2021REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTFS RODOLFO PEREZ AND OLIVIA LOPEZ PEREZ
Date: March 09, 2021ORDER TO RESPOND AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE
Date: March 29, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFT BRICKHOUSE LODGE INC
Date: March 30, 2021ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION ORDER
Date: May 21, 2021NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTFS
Date: May 24, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT BRICKHOUSE LODGE INC
Date: June 01, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTFS RODOLFO PEREZ AND OLIVIA LOPEZ PEREZ
Date: June 04, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: June 14, 2021CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY BRICKHOUSE LODGE INC
Date: June 23, 2021NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 07, 2021EFILED SUMMONS
Date: September 01, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DIGITAL DEPOSITION OF PLTF RODOLFO PEREZ FILED BY DEFT BRICKHOUSE LODGE
Date: October 27, 2021ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: September 03, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT BRICKHOUSE LODGE INC
Date: September 28, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BOAZ SECURITY LLC WAYNE COUNCIL BROTHER OF JUAN COUNCIL
Date: October 06, 2021ANSWER FILED BY DEFT BOAZ SECURITY LLC
Date: October 22, 2021PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF RODOLFO PEREZ TO DEFT BRICKHOUSE LODGE
Date: January 12, 2022PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF OLIVIA PEREZ TO DEFT BRICKHOUSE LODGE
Date: January 12, 2022ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDATION ORDER
Date: November 10, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: February 01, 2022AMENDED NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE
Date: November 10, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION FILED BY PLTFS RODOLFO PEREZ AND OLIVIA LOPEZ PEREZ
Date: November 11, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFT BRICKHOUSE LODGE INC
Date: January 06, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT BRICKHOUSE LODGE INC
Date: January 06, 2022SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED FOR CHARLES EDWARD TERRELL JENKINS
Date: January 06, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE CASE NUMBER ON DOCUMENT IS INCORRECT SHOULD BE 21CA75
Date: January 21, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: January 21, 2022ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL
Date: February 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFTS BOAZ SECURITY LLC MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE CASE NUMBER ON DOCUMENT IS INCORRECT SHOULD BE 21CA75 | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF RODOLFO PEREZ TO DEFT BRICKHOUSE LODGE | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF OLIVIA PEREZ TO DEFT BRICKHOUSE LODGE | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFT BRICKHOUSE LODGE INC | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT BRICKHOUSE LODGE INC | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED FOR CHARLES EDWARD TERRELL JENKINS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.