Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Pennymac Loan Services Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gonzalez, Miguel Antonio, against Burns, Karen G, Pine Run Residents Association, Unknown Spouse Of Karen G Burn, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with MUSLEH, VICTOR JOSEPH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMUSLEH, VICTOR JOSEPH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 30, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: December 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY FORECLOSURE SALE PURCHASER BRIGHTLITE HOMES 1 LLC | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopened for CIVIL OTHER on 03/15/2022 | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT REGISTRY-FULLY DISBURSED | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PLTFS ATTORNEY RE DISBURSEMENT CHECK | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 6 assessed at sum $6.00 | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $127,867.42 Receipt Number XX 718891 | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.