Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Meb Loan Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rosaler, Brian Lee, against Ocana, Eduardo, Ocana, Luis, The Marion Oaks Civic Associat, Unknown Spouse Of Eduardo Ocan, Unknown Spouse Of Luis Ocana, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with MUSLEH, VICTOR JOSEPH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMUSLEH, VICTOR JOSEPH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 07, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 27, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY RE ORIGINAL NOTE AND COPY OF MORTGAGE RETURNED PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION FOR DISMISSAL CONT SEE DOC | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT RABBI YOSEF KONIKOV | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: MUSLEH , VICTOR J Assigned | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | AO 2021-29 CIVIL BACKLOG DOCKET CASE REASSIGNED TO SENIOR JUDGE - JUDGE MUSLEH | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLTF FILED ON NOVEMBER 20 2020 | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL TRUST ASSOCIATION | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLEADINGS FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.