Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pidherney, Marsha Sue, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Anderson, Daniel Graham, against Marion County Florida, represented by Minter, Matthew Guy, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with SANDERS, GARY LAMAR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSANDERS, GARY LAMAR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
WITNESS LIST FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: December 27, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 20, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 20, 2019NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT
Date: February 14, 2020EFILED SUMMONS
Date: December 20, 2019SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION
Date: April 28, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 20, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 20, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS
Date: January 29, 2020NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT
Date: February 14, 2020ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS
Date: January 29, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT
Date: February 14, 2020DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS
Date: January 29, 2020ORDER TO RESPOND AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE
Date: July 28, 2020NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: March 30, 2020NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY
Date: April 28, 2020CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: March 03, 2020NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY
Date: July 13, 2020CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: August 12, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS
Date: February 27, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: July 22, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: March 30, 2020NOTICE OF SERVIEC OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: April 08, 2020NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS
Date: February 27, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFT
Date: July 15, 2020NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY
Date: July 17, 2020ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: August 17, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: May 06, 2020CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: May 11, 2020NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY
Date: August 14, 2020ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION ORDER
Date: September 29, 2020NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: October 08, 2020CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: July 28, 2020NOTICE-NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: July 30, 2020CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: August 25, 2020RESPONSE TO PLTFS MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: June 28, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: June 07, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL PLTFS COMPLETE DISCOVERY RESPONSES FILED ON JULY 22 2020
Date: October 12, 2020CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: October 08, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: October 13, 2020ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL
Date: April 22, 2021WITNESS LIST AMENDED FILED BY MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: June 23, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 12, 2021MEDIATION REPORT
Date: February 19, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OFFER OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: December 17, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: February 16, 2021NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: October 13, 2020NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: February 16, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 10, 2021RESPONSE TO MOTION IN LIMINE AMENDED FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: June 29, 2021WITNESS LIST FOR TRIAL FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: June 21, 2021WITNESS LIST FILED BY MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: June 22, 2021EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE FILED PER PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: June 07, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE RELATING TO EXPERT WITNESSES FILED BY MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: June 23, 2021WITNESS LIST FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES BOECHER INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF
Date: June 23, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 15, 2021MOTION-MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: July 23, 2021PRETRIAL COMPLIANCE PRETRIAL STATEMENT FILED BY MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: August 13, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 27, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 26, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY
Date: July 28, 2021ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS FILED JULY 23 2021
Date: September 24, 2021NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF DR JAMES R IPSER TAKEN AUGUST 2 2021
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE RE FINAL TRIAL MEMORANDUM FOR JUDGE SANDERS OCT 4 2021
Date: September 01, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: August 25, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION OF DR JAMES R IPSER TAKEN AUGUST 26 2021
Date: September 13, 2021PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: August 20, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF LORENDA PERRY
Date: August 04, 2021ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: August 11, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION OF LORENDA PERRY FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING SEPTEMBER 29 2021 AT 345 PM
Date: September 29, 2021EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING SEPTEMBER 30 2021 AT 345 PM
Date: September 29, 2021AMENDED ORDER RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL
Date: November 15, 2021NOTICE OF ADMENDMENT TO DEFTS EXPERT WITNESS LIST FOR TRIAL FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: November 29, 2021ORDER ON PLTFS MOTION TO STRIKE OR EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR JAMES IPSER
Date: October 08, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY
Date: December 10, 2021PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT SECOND NOTICE FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: December 06, 2021NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: December 09, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 17, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: December 10, 2021WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: December 22, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: February 03, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 20, 2019NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY
Date: July 29, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE RELATING TO SURVEILLANCE FILED BY MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: June 23, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: August 10, 2021WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: December 10, 2021CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: December 22, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY
Date: July 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLTF MARSHA SUE PIDHERNEY | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT SECOND NOTICE FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.