Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Vystar Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Becker, Jeffrey Randolph, against Sapp, Jessica M, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with SANDERS, GARY LAMAR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSANDERS, GARY LAMAR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER REQUIRING SHERIFF TO ENTER LOCKED PREMISES
Date: January 08, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE FILED BY PLTF VYSTAR CREDIT UNION | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT COPY TO FINANCE-EMAILED A COPY OF CORR FROM CLERKS OFFICE RETURNED BY BIANCA WHEELER | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE RETURNED BY BIANCA WHEELER | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING CLERK TO RETURN THE ORIGINAL REPLEVIN BOND | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | WRIT OF REPLEVIN UNEXECUTED ON DEFT JESSICA M SAPP | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON DEFT JESSICA M SAPP | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION FOR THE RETURN OF THE REPLEVIN BOND FILED BY PLTF VYSTAR CREDIT UNION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.