Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kasper, Kathryn Ishee, against Aqua Finance Inc., Herring, Mildred G, Silver Springs Shores Resident, Unknown Party In Possession 1, Unknown Party In Possession 2, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with Gary L. Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary L. Sanders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Forecl $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC against Mildred G. Herring, Unknown Party in Possession 1, Unknown Party in Possession 2, Unknown Spouse of Mildred G. Herring, Silver Springs Shores Residents' Association,...
PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: December 18, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: December 18, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING FROM MILDRED G HERRING | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ANY OFFICER OR AGENT TO ACCEPT SERVICE FOR SILVER SPRINGS SHORES RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION INC | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MILDRED G HERRING | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2 | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MILDRED G HERRING | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1 | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT AQUA FINANCE INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.